Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Williams
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02812
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 14, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice re Trans Union LLC; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Stipulation; Discovery due by 8/6/2018. Motions due by 9/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 14, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Stipulation; Re: 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 28 Motion to Strike, Replies due by 2/20/2018. Responses due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 22, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Stipulation; Re: 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Responses due by 1/30/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 3, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Stipulation; Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 12, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Stipulation; Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 12/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Williams
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?