Lease v. Aviation Institute of Maintenance et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Lease
Defendant: Aviation Institute of Maintenance and Joseph Lemoine
Case Number: 2:2017cv02835
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court again ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report, this time by 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 21, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report by 7/3/2018, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 14, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Arbitrate and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 7, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Lucas for Aviation Institute of Maintenance and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lisa A. McClane. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 29, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation to Extend Time re 3 Motion to Compel (First Request). Responses due by 12/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lease v. Aviation Institute of Maintenance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Institute of Maintenance
Represented By: Thomas M. Lucas
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lease
Represented By: Neal Kevin Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?