Zyppah, Inc. v. Allemeier

Petitioner: Zyppah, Inc.
Respondent: Daniel Allemeier, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02840
Filed: November 10, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 28 Allemeier's motion for attorney's fees is DENIED, 35 Allemeier's supplemental motion for attorney's fees is DENIED as moot, and 37 Zyppah's motion to strike Allemeier's supplemental motion for attorney's fees is also DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 24, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 10 Allemeier's motion to dismiss is GRANTED and 1 Zyppah's petition and 8 motion to compel arbitration are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter an order dismissing this action and to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 17, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sherry L. Swieca for Zyppah, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Donald P. Paradiso. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 22, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Allemeier, Sr. for Daniel Allemeier, Jr. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kathleen M. Paustian. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey o n 12/22/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zyppah, Inc. v. Allemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Allemeier, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Allemeier, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zyppah, Inc.
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?