Salvador v. Bank Of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Editha F. Salvador
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon, Bank of America, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Quality Loan Servicing Corp. and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02857
Filed: November 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 67 Motion; ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; Amended Complaint deadline: 5/18/2018. Clerk shall seal 1 and 3 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Quality Loan Servicing Corp. (or any other defendant) may supplement the record by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 4/24/2018 to show the nine-month period in called for in Nevada Revised Statutes § 107.550(1) has not expired because of tolling. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Re: 67 Motion. Responses due by 4/19/2018. Replies due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 32 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Plaintiff must initiate a scheduling conference to be held no later than February 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador v. Bank Of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Servicing Corp.
Represented By: Priscilla L Baker
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Corrine P. Murphy
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Editha F. Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?