Iwaniszek v. Pride Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen J Iwaniszek
Defendant: Pride Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02918
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of the claims in plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 11 ) are dismissed without prejudice but with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERAdopting Report and Recommendations re 6 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 8 Plaintiff Steven J. Iwaniszek's Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Mr. Iwaniszek shall have until 4/19/19, to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Iwaniszek shall file a certificate of interested parties as required by LR 7.1-1 of the Local Rules of Practice by 4/19/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL FILE 1 -1 Plaintiff Steven J. Iwaniszek's proposedComplaint but SHALL NOT issue summons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended com plaint by 3/14/19, if Mr. Iwaniszek believes he can correct the noted deficiencies. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Iwaniszek shall file a certificate of interested parties as required by LR 7.1-1 of the Local Rules of Practice on or before 3/14/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: 1 -1 Complaint, Complaint for Employment Discrimination - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iwaniszek v. Pride Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J Iwaniszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?