Novick v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Jay Novick
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02977
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Stipulation to dismiss with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Stipulation; Re: 12 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 11, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Stipulation; CitiMortgage, Inc. answer due 12/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 5, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed in State Court, Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novick v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jay Novick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?