Geraldo v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dany Geraldo
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02979
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Richard F. Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 2, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC's answer due 2/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 1, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC's answer due 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC's answer due 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 22, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC's answer due 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geraldo v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dany Geraldo
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?