Smith v. Citibank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Stephen L. Smith
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02993
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court ORDERS these parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/20/18. The Court VACATES all other deadlines between these parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 1/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Smith
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?