March 6, 2020 |
Filing
137
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 20, 2019 |
Filing
127
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 122 defendants' motion for leave to file surreply be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 123 defendants motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 124 , 125 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 6, 2019 |
Filing
121
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 94 Defendants Midwest Industrial Supply Company and Alliance Automotive's Motion to Seal is DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 118 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal is DENIED, without p rejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the subject documents shall remain sealed. The parties may file renewed motions to seal no later than 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Filing
82
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 80 defendants' motion to extend time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 79 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have until 5/23/2019, to file a response to plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall seal exhibits C, E, I, J, K, L, and M of Kenneth E. Keller's declaration (ECF Nos. 77 -36, 77 -38, 77 -42, 77 -43, 77 -44, 77 -45, 77 -46). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 3, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 70 defendants' motion for clarification be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 , 61 plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees be, and the same he reby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall strike 60 , 61 , 62 plaintiffs' motions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 1, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 58 plaintiffs' motion to amend be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
November 19, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER. IS HEREBY ORDERED that 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file the amended complaint attached to its 28 Motion for Leave as Exhibit 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion hearing set for 11/28/18 at 9:30 AM is hereby vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
May 2, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Midwest Industrial Supply Company answer due 5/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER Granting 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason R. Erb for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
9
ORDER Granting 8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher E. Stretch for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|