Ruiz v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: James Steven Ruiz
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv03036
Filed: December 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Voluntary Remand. IT IS SO ORDERED. All pending motions (ECF Nos. 15 , 19 ) are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant, reversing the final decision of the Commissioner and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re: 15 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint, serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration via certified mail, and issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Steven Ruiz
Represented By: Jenna Barson
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?