Cotton v. Cruden et al
Plaintiff: Julie Cotton
Defendant: Brown & Brown Insurance of Nevada, Inc., Brown & Brown, Inc., Brian Cruden, Clara Cruden and Dave Lester
Case Number: 2:2017cv03087
Filed: December 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE on ECF No. 38 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 34 Joint Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing on 5/18/2018. The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hear ing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton v. Cruden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown Insurance of Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara Cruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Cotton
Represented By: Puneet Kumar Garg
Represented By: Anthony B. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?