March 10, 2025 |
Filing
73
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's 71 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' 72 Motion for Extension of Time to file reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The deadline to reply is extended to April 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
|
January 3, 2025 |
Filing
69
ORDER granting 68 Motion to Extend Time nunc pro tunc. The deadline to oppose is extended to February 28, 2025. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/3/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
|
September 10, 2024 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 64 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Fourth Amended Petition. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 11/19/2024; Charles Daniels answer due 11/19/2024; Calvin Johnson answer due 11/19/2024. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
|
April 24, 2024 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 58 Motion to Reopen Case. It is further ordered that Petitioner has 90 days from the date of this Order to FILE AND SERVE on Respondents a Fourth-Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is further ordered that Respon dents file a response to the Fourth-Amended Petition within 60 days of service of the Petition, with any requests for relief by Petitioner by motion otherwise being subject to the normal briefing schedule under the Local Rules. It is fu rther ordered that Petitioner has 45 days from service of the response to file a Reply or Opposition, with any other requests for relief by Respondents by motion otherwise being subject to the normal briefing schedule under the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/24/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
|
May 18, 2022 |
Filing
55
ORDER.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the joint stipulation (ECF No. 54 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to file a third amended petition (ECF No. 52 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at the Clerk of Court detach and file the third amended petition at ECF No. [52-1]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 35 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' mot ion for extension of time to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 53 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending final resolution of petitioners state postconviction habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner returning to federal court with a motion to reopen the case within forty-five (45) days of the issuance of the remittitur by the state appellate court, at the conclusion of the state court proceedings on the post conviction habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
April 4, 2022 |
Filing
51
ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 44 Response re 35 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 5/16/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
February 17, 2022 |
Filing
49
ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Extend Time to reply in support of 35 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
February 14, 2022 |
Filing
47
ORDER Granting nunc pro tunc 43 Motion to Extend Time. ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Extend Time. The court is highly unlikely, absent extraordinary circumstances, to grant any further extensions of time. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
August 31, 2021 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting nunc pro tunc 29 , 30 , 31 , 32 Motions to Extend Time re 28 Order (First-Fourth Request). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 15, 2020 |
Filing
28
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 26 petitioner's motion to reopen this action is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as the stay is lifted by this order, the Clerk REOPEN THE FILE in this action. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 7, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 19 petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 18 petitioner's motion for leave to file a second-amended petition is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending final resolution of petitioner's state postconviction habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 the court's scheduling order dated 8/6/2018 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk SHALL ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible, if counsel has not already done so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have ninety (90) days from the date of this order to FILE AND SERVE on respondents an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties SHALL SEND courtesy copies of all exhibits to the Reno Division of this court. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 20, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall detach and file 1 -1 the habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is DE NIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|