Federal Trade Commission v. Consumer Defense LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: AM Property Management, LLC, American Home Loan Counselors, American Home Loans, LLC, Brown Legal, Inc, Consumer Defense Group, LLC, Consumer Defense LLC, Consumer Defense, LLC, Consumer Link Inc, FMG Partners, LLC, Jonathan P. Hanley, Sandra X Hanley, Benjamin R Horton, Prefered Law, PLLC and Zinly, LLC
Interested Party: Phillip Francis Hanley
Receiver: Thomas W. McNamara
Case Number: 2:2018cv00030
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the court will moot the following objections and motions still pending before the court: (1) 195 defendant Jonathan Hanley's objection to magistrate judge order; (2) 275 Hanley's motion to deem requests for ad mission admitted; (3) 276 Hanley's emergency motion to expedite; (4) 310 Hanley's motion for hearing before district judge; and (5) 314 Hanley's motion to strike.The clerk shall enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER Granting 304 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 302 Response (First Request). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 200 Mr. Hanley's motion for leave to amend his motion to quash with supplemental exhibits is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 196 Mr. Hanley's Motion to Quash Subpoena is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Granting 290 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 255 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER Granting 261 Stipulation for Briefing Schedule re 255 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED 216 defendant Jonathan Hanley's motion to extend discovery deadlines is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to respond to 255 the pending motion for summary judgment is temporarily STAYED to allow Hanley t o depose the FTC's expert witness before responding to the motion for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 8/9/19, the parties must meet and confer and file a stipulation with a proposed schedule for (1) deposing the FTC's expert, and (2) filing responses and replies in support of the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Granting 246 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 216 Emergency Motion to Extend Discovery. Motion Hearing reset for 7/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until 6/11/2019 to file a stipulation for the undersigned to remain on this case after a settlement conference is conducted if the case does not settle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting 217 Motion to Extend Time re 208 Motion to Determine Sufficiency (First Request). Response due by 5/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against corporate defendants Consumer Defense, LLC, Preferred Law, PLLC, American Home Loan Counselors, Consumer Defense Group, LLC, American Home Loans, LLC, AM Property Management, LLC, FMG Partners, LLC, Brown Legal, Inc., and Zinly, LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Denying 154 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and 159 Motion to Compel Production of Records from the Receiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 101 McNamara's motion for authorization to sell real property and vehicles be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 118 the FTC's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 123 the stipulation to extend time to file a response to the FTC's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 126 the FTC's motion for clerks entry of default be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 127 the FTC's motion to admit Jason D. Schall to practice in the District of Nevada be, and the same hereby is, GRANTE D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 133 the Utah entities and the Hanleys' motion for release of funds be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 158 the Hanleys' second motion for release of funds be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 160 the Hanleys' motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified on 1/18/2019 to correct date Judge signed order (DKJ).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting 151 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the defendants with a copy of this order at their last known addresses. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 139 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 133 Motion for Release of Funds for Attorney's Fees. Replies due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting 124 Motion to Withdraw Adam M Wesolowski as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 3 the FTC's motion to temporarily seal case file and 4 motion to file TRO motion in excess of page limits be, and the same hereby are, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [32 ] Hanley's demand motion to have plaintiff or prosecutor certify the right of subrogation be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of receiver Thomas W. McNamara's motion for attorney's fees. The court approves the payment of the following requested amounts for fees and expenses incurred through 2/28/2018 from the estates assets curre ntly within the receivers control: $55,512.50 fees and $3,557.20 expenses of the receiver and professional staff to be paid to Thomas W. McNamara d/b/a Regulatory Resolutions; $49,017.50 fees and $6,488.89 expenses of the receiver s counsel, McNamara Smith LLP; $933.30 fees of the receivers local counsel, Ballard Spahr LLP; $5,600.00 fees and $938.09 expenses of the receivers computer forensic expert, Hadron Computer Forensics & Investigations; and $12,188.10 fees of the receivers forensic accountant, Lone Peak Valuation Group. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 24 defendant Horton's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction or transfer venue be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that 40 the Utah entities and th e Hanleys' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that 45 the corporate defendants and the Hanleys' motion to dismiss on the basis of forum non conveniens be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 110 Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment as to Defendant Benjamin Horton. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 53 Proposed Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 39 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JD Lauritzen for American Home Loan Counselors, American Home Loans, LLC, Consumer Defense Group, LLC, Consumer Defense LLC, Consumer Defense, LLC, Consumer Link Inc, Brown Legal, Inc, FMG Partners, LLC, Jonathan P. Hanley, Sandra X Hanley, Zinly, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Gregory Miles. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Second Request). Motion Hearing reset for 2/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing re 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Lift Temporary Seal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Consumer Defense LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Loan Counselors
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Loans, LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Legal, Inc
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Defense Group, LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Defense LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Defense, LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Link Inc
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMG Partners, LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Hanley
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra X Hanley
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin R Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prefered Law, PLLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zinly, LLC
Represented By: JD Lauritzen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Karra J Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Gregory A. Ashe
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Represented By: Adam M Wesolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Phillip Francis Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Edward T. Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?