Federal Trade Commission et al v. EMP Media, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: State of Nevada and Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: EMP Media, Inc., Yeicox Ltd., Shad Applegate and Aniello Infante
Case Number: 2:2018cv00035
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
1 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Yeicox Ltd. is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to timely serve. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 19, 2018 31 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 01/09/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Yeicox Ltd..* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 7/19/2018. (TR)
June 18, 2018 30 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs, Federal Trade Commission and State of Nevada, and against Defendants, EMP Media, Inc. and Shad Applegate. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 15, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting #24 , 26 , #28 Motion for Default Judgment and Final Order for Permanent Injunction and Other Relief. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 14, 2018 28 MOTION for Default Judgment with Additional Redactions by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Ex 1- Decl of Cheryl Thomas, #3 Index Index of Attachments to Ex 1 - Thomas Decl, #4 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 1, #5 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 2, #6 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 3, #7 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 4, #8 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 5, #9 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 6, #10 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 7, #11 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 8, #12 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 9, #13 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 10, #14 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 11, #15 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 12, #16 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 13, #17 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 14, #18 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 15, #19 Attachments to Ex 1 Part 16, #20 Exhibit Ex 2 - Consumer Decl, #21 Exhibit Ex 3 - Consumer Decl, #22 Exhibit Ex 4 - Consumer Decl, #23 Exhibit Ex 5 - Decl of Thomas Van Wazer, #24 Exhibit Ex 6 - Infante Investigational Hearing Transcript, #25 Exhibit Ex 7 - Consumer Decl, #26 Exhibit Ex 8 - Decl of Carrie Goldberg, #27 Exhibit Ex 9 - Consumer Decl, #28 Exhibit Ex 10 - Consumer Decl, #29 Exhibit Ex 11 - Consumer Decl, #30 Exhibit Ex 12 - Consumer Decl, #31 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cox, Megan)
June 12, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting #25 Motion to Seal and Ordering Additional Redactions. The clerk shall seal all exhibits to ECF No. #24 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 11, 2018 25 MOTION to Seal #24 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Cox, Megan)
June 11, 2018 24 MOTION for Default Judgment; filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Thomas Decl, #3 Index to Declaration, #4 Attachment 1 to Declaration, #5 Attachment 2 to Declaration, #6 Attachment 3 to Declaration, #7 Attachment 4 to Declaration, #8 Attachment 5 to Declaration, #9 Attachment 6 to Declaration, #10 Attachment 7 to Declaration, #11 Attachment 8 to Declaration, #12 Attachment 9 to Declaration, #13 Attachment 10 to Declaration, #14 Attachment 11 to Declaration, #15 Attachment 12 to Declaration, #16 Attachment 13 to Declaration, #17 Attachment 14 to Declaration, #18 Attachment 15 to Declaration, #19 Attachment 16 to Declaration, #20 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #21 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #22 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #23 Exhibit Thomas Van Wazer Declaration, #24 Exhibit Transcript, #25 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #26 Exhibit Carrie Goldberg Declaration, #27 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #28 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #29 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #30 Exhibit Consumer Declaration, #31 Proposed Order) (Cox, Megan) Modified on 6/12/2018 to Seal Exhibits per #27 Order (MR).
May 11, 2018 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EMP Media, Inc. and Shad Applegate re #22 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (MR)
May 10, 2018 22 First MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs Federal Trade Commission, State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Counsel Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Form for Proposed Default Entry by Clerk) (Cox, Megan)
March 16, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #16 Order on Motion,,,,, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Smith)(Cox, Megan)
March 16, 2018 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Aniello Infante, and as Registered Agent for EMP Media, Inc. served on 1/19/2018, answers due 2/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Service Executed)(Cox, Megan) Modified on 3/22/2018 to reflect correct party served (TR).
March 13, 2018 19 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 01/09/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Defendant Cottelli per Order #16 .* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 4/12/2018. (TR) Modified on 3/13/2018 to reflect correct Defendant (TR). (Main Document 19 replaced on 3/13/2018) (TR).
February 1, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' full 14 motion for alternative service shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER. The Court finds that service by email on Defendant Cottelli is proper and GRANTS #12 , 14 Plaintiffs' motion for alternative service. Plaintiffs shall effectuate service, no later than 2/9/2018. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2018 15 MOTION to Seal #12 Motion, #13 Order, by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Cox, Megan)
January 29, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER re #12 Motion for Alternative Service. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an unredacted copy under seal pursuant to Local Rule IC 6-1(b), no later than 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 26, 2018 12 MOTION re: Alternative Service, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 2/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Cox, Megan)
January 22, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Denying #10 Motion to Stay Case as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/22/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 22, 2018 10 MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Cox, Megan)
January 10, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting #8 Joint Stipulation for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2018 8 Joint STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Trade Commission, State of Nevada. (Cox, Megan)
January 10, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
January 9, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #4 the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment as to Defendant Aniello Infante is DENIED without prejudice as to the filing of a revised stipulation that complies with Local Rule 1A 6-2. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 9, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
January 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
January 9, 2018 4 Joint STIPULATION by Plaintiffs Federal Trade Commission, State of Nevada. (Cox, Megan)
January 9, 2018 3 MOTION to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney; filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Cox, Megan)
January 9, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Trade Commission. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cox, Megan)
January 9, 2018 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. Proof of service due by 4/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Cox, Megan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. EMP Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Laura Michelle Tucker
Represented By: Megan Cox
Represented By: John R. McGlamery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Allison M Lefrak
Represented By: Megan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeicox Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aniello Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?