Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Joint Management and Culinary and Bartenders Training Fund v. Fava et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Joint Management and Culinary and Bartenders Training Fund
Defendant: 21 Greens, Inc, Eclipse Theater Las Vegas, Limited Partnership, Eclipse Theater, LLC, Christopher Fava, Federal Insurance Company, HKM Productions, Inc. and Jaime Monardes
Case Number: 2:2018cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2018 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 10 Motion for Order Shortening Time are DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 2, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 29 Federal's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 defendants' Eclipse Theater LLC, Eclipse Theater Las Vegas, Limited Partnership, and 21 Greens Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 56 Motion for Leave to File plaintiff's Reply Under Seal is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk's office must unseal plaintiff's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 51 ), defendant's response (ECF No. 53 ), and plaintiff's reply (ECF No. 57 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re: 29 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/4/2018. Replies due by 4/18/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 15, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 , 34 Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process and for Service by Publication. Proof of service due by 7/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Christopher Fava answer due 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 6, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. HKM Productions, Inc. answer due 3/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Joint Management and Culinary and Bartenders Training Fund v. Fava et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21 Greens, Inc
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Theater Las Vegas, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Theater, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Fava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKM Productions, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Monardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Joint Management and Culinary and Bartenders Training Fund
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?