Kirk v. Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lee Kirk
Defendant: Herbert Cortez, Shaun Hanna, Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC and Steve Williams
Case Number: 2:2018cv00043
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to File Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED that 15 Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss is hereby deemed to have been withdrawn without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendants will respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 5/2/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 STIPULATION for Exception to Attendance Requirements; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) Re: 15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/11/2018. Replies due by 4/25/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/28/2018. Replies due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 20, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Time. Steve Williams answer due 3/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time re: 1 Complaint. Herbert Cortez answer due 3/6/2018; Shaun Hanna answer due 3/6/2018; Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC answer due 3/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Cortez
Represented By: Timothy Roehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Hanna
Represented By: Timothy Roehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Roehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Kirk
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?