Zervas v. USAA General Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Emily Zervas
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00051
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 16 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending the Outcome of Motion for Summary Judgment and 19 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 4, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 16 Motion to Stay Discovery. Replies due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 6, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 16 Motion to Stay Discovery, Responses due by 4/30/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 5/16/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zervas v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Zervas
Represented By: William W. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?