U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Fodor Family Trust
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Fodor Family Trust
Case Number: 2:2018cv00077
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 53 Second Amended Complaint. Palo Verde Homeowners Association, Inc.'s answer due 6/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Stipulation; Palo Verde Homeowners Association, Inc. answer due 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss, Granting 35 Motion to Dismiss, Denying as moot 36 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying as moot 48 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying as moot 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/22/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation; Re: 36 Motion for Summary Judgment, 35 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 24 Amended Complaint. Palo Verde Homeowners Association, Inc. answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulation; Discovery due by 12/14/2018. Motions due by 1/14/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend/Correct; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Fodor Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fodor Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?