Jolie Design & Decor, Inc. et al v. BB Frosch, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Annie Sloan Interiors, Ltd. and Jolie Design & Decor, Inc.
Defendant: BB Frosch, LLC, JKKJKK Trust, Jason Smith and Kristin Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv00145
Filed: January 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 89 Objection to 88 Report and Recommendation (First Request). Response to Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 84 Motion to Set Aside (First Request). Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff, Annie Sloan Interiors, Ltd., and against Defendants, BB Frosch, LLC and JKKJKK Trust. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any objection to 75 the Report and Recommendation must be filed on or before 7/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time to file an objection to 75 the Report and Recommendation is STAYED pending further order of this court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 6/28/2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 71 J. Matthew Miller III and Raymond G. Areaux Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 the Substitution of Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss for improper venue, for lack of personal jurisdiction, and for failure to state a claim is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to transfer is GRANTED and that, pur suant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 and in the interest of justice, the matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. FURTHER ORDERED that, with the consent of counsel, the defendants are ordered to pay to plaintiffs &# 036;1,200 in attorneys' fees no later than 2/5/2018 and that the defendants' motion to appeal the decision of the United States Magistrate Judge as well as the plaintiffs' motion for attorneys fees are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/24/2018.(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/26/2018.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolie Design & Decor, Inc. et al v. BB Frosch, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Sloan Interiors, Ltd.
Represented By: Raymond Gerard Areaux
Represented By: Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
Represented By: Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolie Design & Decor, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Gerard Areaux
Represented By: Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
Represented By: Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB Frosch, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Menhart
Represented By: Maro Petkovich, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKKJKK Trust
Represented By: Eric J. Menhart
Represented By: Maro Petkovich, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smith
Represented By: Eric J. Menhart
Represented By: Maro Petkovich, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Smith
Represented By: Eric J. Menhart
Represented By: Maro Petkovich, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?