Bouari v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ghassan Houbous Bouari
Defendant: Elena Iatarola, Dennis Lao, Charles Ro and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00219
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: 40 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/26/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Stipulation to Extend time to Answer Complaint; Answer(s) due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay on this case is lifted as the indictment of the last remaining defendant in the related criminal case (16-cv-00032-JCM-EJY) was dismissed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice the FederalTort Claims Act causes of action currently denominated as Counts V, VI, VII, VIII and IX in the complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer 31 Amended Complaint. Dennis Lao and Charles Ro answers due 2/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is GRANTED as unopposed. LR 7-2(d). TheClerk of Court is kindly directed to detach and separately docket plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation; Re: 12 Motion to Dismiss, 13 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 12/22/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule as to 12 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 12/15/2020. Replies due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Responses and Replies Re: 12 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Stipulation te Extend Deadlines as to 12 Motion to Dismiss, 13 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/16/2020. Replies due by 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. All filing deadlines are extended to 60 days after the resolution of the related criminal case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Defendants Dennis Lao and United States of America's answer due 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouari v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghassan Houbous Bouari
Represented By: Benjamin C Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Iatarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?