Focalpoint International Inc. v. Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Focalpoint International Inc.
Defendant: Bizstratplan Inc. and Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00236
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Stipulation. Discovery due by 11/19/2018. Motions due by 12/21/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 12, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Bizstratplan Inc. answer due 5/29/2018; Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc. answer due 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 3, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Bizstratplan Inc. answer due 5/21/2018; Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc. answer due 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 19 FocalPoint's Motion for Expedited Hearing is GRANTED. Motion Hearing re: 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and 13 FocalPoint's Motion to Enjoin is set for 4/23/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 11, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Stipulation; Re: 13 Motion to Enforce. Responses due by 4/17/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 3, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond e: 10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/12/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 12, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Bizstratplan Inc. answer due 3/22/2018; Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc. answer due 3/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Focalpoint International Inc. v. Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizstratplan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dom Rubino Consulting Services Inc.
Represented By: Dan R Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Focalpoint International Inc.
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?