Dropp et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph M. Dropp, Mary E. Dropp, Robert Levine, Susan Levine and Kaarina Pakka
Defendant: Apollo Global Management, LLC, Apollo Management VIII, L.P., Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Holding, LLC, Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association, Michael Flaskey and Kenneth Siegel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00247
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Richard F. Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Stipulation to Stay Discovery; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 24, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Stipulation; Re: 43 Motion to Strike, 42 Motion to Dismiss, 37 Motion to Dismiss,, 39 Motion to Sever, 35 Motion to Sever, 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases, 38 Motion to Strike,, 40 Motion to Change Venue , 41 Motion to Compel, 31 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, 36 Motion to Change Venue, 27 Motion Responses due by 5/15/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 29, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Stipulation; All Defendants Answer due 4/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 2, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Stipulation; All Defendants Answer due 4/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dropp et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Global Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Management VIII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Holding, LLC
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Flaskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Dropp
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Dropp
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Levine
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Levine
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaarina Pakka
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?