Gonzales v. Gentry et al

Petitioner: Alfred Christopher Gonzales
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Jo Gentry
Case Number: 2:2018cv00266
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time. Respondents will have until October 19, 2018, to file their brief in response to the order of August 20, 2018 (ECF No. 16 ).FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for the further briefing set forth in the order entered August 20, 2018 (ECF No. 16 ) will remain in effect (the petitioner will have 30 days to file his responsive brief). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 11, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Motion for Appointment of Counsel.FURTHER ORDERED that 18 "Motion in Limine" is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of the following documents to the Petitioner: ECF Nos. 1 , 3 , 4 , 7 , 8 , 9 , 12 , 13 , 14 , and 16 . Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 20, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 7 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, without prejudice to Respondents asserting the same arguments later in this action, if and when that becomes appropriate.FURTHER ORDERED that, within 30 days from the date of this ord er, Respondents are to file a memorandum of points and authorities regarding the following issues:1. As the petition in this action concerns the September 30, 2015, judgment, does the entry of the March 1, 2018, amended judgment render this acti on moot, and subject to dismissal on that ground?2. As it appears that there has been no state-court litigation relative to the March 1, 2018, amended judgment, would all claims concerning that amended judgment be unexhausted in state court, such that a federal habeas action relative to the amended judgment would be premature and subject to dismissal on that ground?After Respondents file that memorandum, the petitioner will have 30 days to file a response. Respondents will then have 20 days to file a reply.FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 respondents' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 5 Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until May 16, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the habeas petition. FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered February 14, 2018 (ECF No. 3 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus and a copy of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 60 days from the date of entry of this order to appear in this action, and to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Ashley Alexandria Balducci
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jo Gentry
Represented By: Ashley Alexandria Balducci
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfred Christopher Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?