Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00270
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (First Request). Freedom Mortgage Corporation answer due 7/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 19, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc. answer due 5/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Russell Jason Burke
Represented By: Louis L. Chodoff
Represented By: Christopher T. Cognato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?