Dalocanog v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Dalocanog
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and Transunion, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00271
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Transunion, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than May 1, 2018, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Transunion, LLC answer due 4/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalocanog v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dalocanog
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?