Leonardo v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Leslie R Leonardo
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00279
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 18 Motion to Remand. Defendant's Responses due by 8/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 17, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 18 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 8/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 28, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of Court must file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonardo v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Tina L. Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie R Leonardo
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?