United States of America v. Kern et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Advanced Allocation Systems, Inc, All American Awards, Inc, Andrea Burrow, Epifanio Castro, Distribution Reporting Center, Inc, Stephen Fennell, Funding Managers, Inc, Global Data Funding, Inc, Golden Products Service, Inc, Patricia Kern, Marketing Image Direct, Inc, Montgomery Marketing, Inc. LLC, NSD Products Inc, Neptune Data Services, Inc, New Generation Graphics Inc, North American Disbursement Agency, Inc, Sean O'Connor, Pacific Allocation Systems, Inc, Edgar Del Rio and Special Money Managers, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00283
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Replevin & Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER for Permanent Injunction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 46 , 48 the United States' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Order for permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER this Default Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation Consent Decree and Final Judgment as to Defendants Golden Products, Castro, and New Generation Graphics. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 8 , 17 the stipulations to continue the briefing schedule and hearing on the order for defendants to show cause, in writing, why the temporary restraining order should not be converted into a preliminary injun ction, and to maintain the temporary restraining order in place pending the hearing on that matter, are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the show-cause hearing set for 3/5/18, is CONTINUED to 4/24/18, at 3 p.m. The time for defendants to respon d to the show-cause order is EXTENDED to 5 p.m. on 4/10/18. The time for the United States to reply to the show-cause order is EXTENDED to 5 p.m. on 4/17/18. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for the temporary restraining order 7 to expire is EXTENDED to 4/24/18, at 4 p.m. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING in part 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order will automatically EXPIRE on March 6, 2018, at 5:30 p.m. unless it is extended by the court for cause or converted into a preliminary injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States is directed to serve the defendants with summonses, copies of the complaint, and copies of this order as soon as practicably possible.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States is not required to post a bond for security for the issuance of this temporary restraining order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to temporarily seal this case 3 is GRANTED. This case will remain SEALED until February 21 , 2018, at 10 a.m., after which time the court will direct the Clerk of Court to unseal this case without further prior notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants are ordered to SHOW CAUSE in writing by February 27, 2018, why this tempo rary restraining order should not be converted into a preliminary injunction. The United States has until March 2, 2018, to file a reply to any response to this show-cause order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Show Cause Hearing is set for 3/5 /2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/20/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC - Troy Flake and Jacqueline Blaesi-Freed - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Allocation Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Awards, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Burrow
Represented By: Crane M Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epifanio Castro
Represented By: Donald J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distribution Reporting Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Fennell
Represented By: Shawn R Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funding Managers, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Data Funding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Products Service, Inc
Represented By: Donald J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kern
Represented By: Andrew B Lustigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketing Image Direct, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Marketing, Inc. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSD Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neptune Data Services, Inc
Represented By: Shawn R Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Generation Graphics Inc
Represented By: Donald J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Disbursement Agency, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Allocation Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Del Rio
Represented By: Brian James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Money Managers, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Blaesi-Freed
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Represented By: Dayle Elieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?