Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Defendant: Alpha Smoke Shop, Inc., High Class Hookah Shop L.L.C., Higuchi Developer, Inc., JTR Incorporated, Miracle 21 Corporation, Mukund Naik, Ryan Store, Inc., Hilal Soham Toma, Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD and David Webber
Case Number: 2:2018cv00369
Filed: February 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that Trepco's and Higuchi's 36 , 49 Motions to Dismiss are Granted. Defendants Ryan Store and High Class's 50 , 51 Joinders are Granted. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Re: 26 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff must file the original surety bond paperwork at the intake window in the clerk of court's office by 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD's answer due 4/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Smoke Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Class Hookah Shop L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higuchi Developer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTR Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle 21 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mukund Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Store, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan Hawley Shigemitsu
Represented By: David J. Winterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilal Soham Toma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bendavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Represented By: Landon Lerner
Represented By: Robert Tauler
Represented By: Kevin Valsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?