Moose Run, LLC v. Libric

Plaintiff: Moose Run, LLC
Defendant: Renato Libric
Case Number: 2:2018cv00425
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 18, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 14 Amended Complaint (First Request). Renato Libric answer due 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 25, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time re 9 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 5/11/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 27, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation for Extension of Tiem re 1 Complaint (First Request). Renato Libric answer due 4/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moose Run, LLC v. Libric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renato Libric
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: Brandi M. Planet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moose Run, LLC
Represented By: Jerome R. Bowen
Represented By: Daniel P. Nubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?