March 25, 2024 |
Filing
95
ORDER Granting 94 Motion to Extend Time re 93 Motion for Hearing. The deadline to file the response is extended to April 12, 2024. Responses due by 4/12/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/25/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
|
January 19, 2024 |
Filing
87
ORDER Granting 86 Motion to File Reply re 80 Answer to 24 Amended Habeas Petition. Replies due by 3/15/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
|
January 9, 2024 |
Filing
85
ORDER Granting 83 Unopposed Motion for Court Order. Within 45 days of the entry of this order, respondents must file with the Court either a supplemental Exhibit 266, consisting of the February 16 or 17, 2011, sealed hearing transcript in pet itioner's underlying state-court matter, or a notice indicating the sealed transcript is unavailable. Petitioner will have 10 days after respondents file a response to this order to admit or deny the correctness of respondents' filing. Clerk status check on 2/23/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
|
November 2, 2023 |
Filing
82
ORDER Granting 81 Motion to Extend Time re 80 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition. Replies due by 1/16/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
|
August 29, 2023 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting 77 and 78 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Renee Baker answer due 9/18/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
May 18, 2023 |
Filing
76
ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Renee Baker answer due 7/14/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
March 17, 2023 |
Filing
74
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents file an answer to the remaining ground in the petition within 60 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner file a reply in support of the petition within 45 days of the date of service of the answer. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
November 23, 2022 |
Filing
70
ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Extend Time. Replies re 62 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
|
September 13, 2022 |
Filing
67
ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Extend Time to file Response to 62 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/11/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
July 25, 2022 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting 63 Motion to Extend Time Re: 62 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
May 16, 2022 |
Filing
61
ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Strike. ORDER Denying as moot 57 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents have 30 days from the date of this order to file their new motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
August 12, 2021 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Renee Baker answer due 9/10/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
June 11, 2019 |
Filing
29
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 26 Motion for Issuance of Stay and Abeyance. Respondents' 28 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to the Petition is Denied as moot. This action is STAYED pending final resolution of Petitioner' s state court proceedings. The Clerk SHALL ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting 21 Fourth Motion to Extend Time. Second Amended Petition due by 4/24/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 19, 2019 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 19 Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Second Amended Petition. Second Amended Petition due by 4/17/2019. Petitioner's 18 Second Motion to Extend Time is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 16 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Petition. Second Amended Petition due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 11 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Petition. The Clerk shall detach and file the 11 -1 First Amended Petition. Petitioner's 12 Motion for Scheduling Order is Granted. Petitioner has 90 days from the date of this Order to file and serve on Respondents a Second Amended Petition.The parties shall send courtesy copies of all exhibits to the Reno Division of this court. (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 6] Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the 1 -1 Petition and add Adam Paul Laxalt, Nevada Attorney General, as counsel for Respondents. Petitioner's 2 Motion fo r Appointment of Counsel is Granted. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada is appointed to represent Petitioner. The FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to th e court its inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. Petitioner's 4 Ex Parte Motion COA arguments is Denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - electronically served FPD and Attorney General this Order and Petition; Order mailed to Petitioner - SLD)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER Denying without prejudice Petitioner's incomplete 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 45 days of the date of this order petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or submit a fully completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - 2 prisoner IFP forms along with instructions mailed to Petitioner - SLD)
|