Briscoe v. Eiucher et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerrod Briscoe |
Defendant: |
District Court, Kenton Eiucher, Joshua D Ferry, Eric Johnson, Justice Court, Lish Luzaich, Metropolitan Police and Daniel Rosequist |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00463 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard F. Boulware |
Referring Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 6, 2019 |
Filing
20
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an updated address in compliance with this Court's 1/9/19 order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 the pending Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that the Clerk of Court will enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/6/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 7, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendants Lish Luzaich, Metropolitan Police, Joshua D Ferry, Justice Court, District Court, and Daniel Rosequist. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
9
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by the U.S. Marshals is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's complaint 7 on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
4
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file 1 -1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?