United States of America v. Douglas H. Clark et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Chip-N-Dale's Custom Landscaping, Inc., Douglas H Clark, Douglas H. Clark, Clark County Treasurer, Republic Services Inc. and Vermiculus Corporation of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2018cv00525
Filed: March 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 56 , 57 , 58 Motions for Default Judgment against Chip-N-Dale's Custom Landscaping, Inc., Susan Griffiths, and Vanessa Robledo. Default judgment is hereby entered against Chip-n-Dale's Custom Landscaping, Susan G riffiths, and Vanessa Robledo establishing that none has any interest in or claim to the real property located at 2985 S. Tenaya Way, Las Vegas, NV, 89117, Assessor Parcel No. 163-10-304-008, which was sold under 50 the Court's 6/3/2019, Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale, or the proceeds of that sale. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale Re: 43 Motion for Judgment and Entry of Order of Sale. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the joint motion to approve the stipulation between the government and Donald Humble (ECF No. 38 ) is GRANTED. The Stipulation is approved. The parties are directed to file a proposed consent judgment consistent with the terms of their stipulation; that judgment should detail the relief that Humble consents to. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 31 the motion to stay is GRANTED; this action is STAYED until the funding for the Department of Justice has been restored. Once it has been restored, any party may file a motion to lift this stay. All pending motions (ECF Nos. 19 , 22 , 23 , 24 ) are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling once the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation re Disclaimer of Interest By Republic Services Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Joint Motion re: Priority. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Douglas H. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip-N-Dale's Custom Landscaping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas H Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas H. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services Inc.
Represented By: Drew J. Starbuck
Represented By: Donald H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermiculus Corporation of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?