Primack v. Ohio Security Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Brett R Primack
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Ohio Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00561
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 62 the parties' Joint Pretrial Order is REJECTED. The parties shall personally confer as required in Local Rule 16-3, and submit a Joint Pretrial Order that complies with Local Rules 16-3 and 16-4 by 12/9/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the parties to file a proposed joint pretrial order by 11/6/2020. Failure to comply may result in the remaining claim being dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 10/16/2020 (JQC).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. I ORDER that 43 the defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED as set forth at the hearing and in this order. Liberty Mutual is dismissed from this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying without prejudice 35 , 36 , 37 , 38 , and 39 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. The depositions shall proceed as scheduled, and any failure to appear may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 23 replaced on 11/29/2018 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 First Stipulation re Discovery. Discovery due by 11/30/2018. Motions due by 12/31/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. A renewed joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order shall be filed no later than May 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primack v. Ohio Security Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C Green
Represented By: Rikki Jo Hevrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C Green
Represented By: Rikki Jo Hevrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett R Primack
Represented By: Eric R. Blank
Represented By: Palmer & Associates P.C.
Represented By: Daniel H Prepas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?