Wynn v. Bloom et al
Plaintiff: Steve Wynn
Defendant: Lisa Bloom and The Bloom Firm
Case Number: 2:2018cv00609
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Second Stipulation to Extend Deadline Set Forth In 49 Order re Renewed Anti-Slapp Motion. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation re Completion of Authorized Discovery and Briefing Schedule on Renewed Anti-Slapp Motion. Discovery due by 8/9/2019. Responses due by 8/30/2019. Replies due within 14 days after service of Wynn's response. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion; Within seven (7) days of this order, the parties shall submit a proposed schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 22 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 18 Special Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynn v. Bloom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bloom
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Alex J. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bloom Firm
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Alex J. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wynn
Represented By: Nikki L. Baker
Represented By: Tamara Beatty Peterson
Represented By: Nicole Jennings Wade
Represented By: G. Taylor Wilson
Represented By: L. Lin Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?