Roberts v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Roberts
Defendant: B. Jackson, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joe Lombardo and A. O'Grady
Case Number: 2:2018cv00649
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Service.The Clerk's Office shall deliver to the United States Marshal Service the 18 -1 Summons for Officer Devore and a copy of the 17 Amended Complaint. Service must be effectuated on D efendant Devore within 60 days from the issuance of this order. Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Extend Time is Denied as moot and the 45 Motion for Reconsideration is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - USM 285 Form mailed to Plaintiff; this Order, Summons and Amended Complaint hand delivered to USM - SLD)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Devore and 36 Motion to Continue All Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Additional Service Attempts on Defendant Devore. Service must be effectuated on Officer Devore within 60 days from the issuance of this order. The Clerk's Office shall deliver to the United Stat es Marshal Service the 18 -1 summons for Officer Devore and a copy of the 17 amended complaint. Within 21 days after receiving from the United States Marshal Service a copy of the USM-285 form showing whether service has been accomplished, Plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying whether Officer Devore were served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - 285 form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that no later than 10/19/2018 LVMPD shall file a waiver of service with respect to Officers LeBlanc and Lilienthal and their response to the amended complaint shall be filed by 11/2/2018. The United States Marshal Service shall refrain from attempting physical service on Officers LeBlanc and Lilienthal. Plaintiff must still provide the USM 285 form for Officer Devore and the United States Marshal Service shall proceed with attempting service on Officer Devore at his last-known address identified in Docket No. 25 once that USM 285 form has been provided by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order and 25 placed in USM box - SLD)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that service must be effectuated on Officers Devore, LeBlanc, and Lilienthal within 90 days from the issuance of this order. Within seven days of the issuance of this order counsel for LVMPD shall file under seal the current home addresses for Officers Devore, LeBlanc, and Lilienthal. Within 21 days of the issuance of this order Plaintiff shall furnish the United States Marshal Service with the required USM-285 forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - (3) 285 forms mailed to Plaintiff; 17 , 18 , and this Order hand delivered to USM - SLD)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Defendants shall file by 10/9/2018 copies of all records and proceedings from the underlying state court action, including any in forma pauperis application and any order on that application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to Amend. The Clerks Office shall file the proposed 12 -1 amended complaint on the docket and issue summonses to Officers Devore, LeBlanc, and Lilienthal. Counsel for the already-appearing Defendants are to file a notice within 14 days of the issuance of this order as to whether they will accept service on behalf of Officers Devore, LeBlanc, and Lilienthal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Jackson
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lombardo
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. O'Grady
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?