A.R. v. Cardiff Sport Technologies, LLC et al

Plaintiff: A. R.
Defendant: Brookstone Stores, Inc. and Cardiff Sport Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00655
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 8 Motion to Change Venue (Second Request). Responses due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 7, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 8 Motion to Change Venue (First Request). Responses due by 5/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 2, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Brookstone Stores, Inc. answer due 5/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.R. v. Cardiff Sport Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Mae Mamer
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiff Sport Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephen G. Castronova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R.
Represented By: Robert M. Adams
Represented By: Dennis M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?