Ramos Meza v. Nielsen et al

Petitioner: Miguel Ramos Meza
Respondent: Thomas E. Feely, Pamela Lauer, Joseph Lombardo, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions and LaTesha Watson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00660
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 2 petitioner's emergency motion for stay of removal and for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 petitioner's motion to extend time to repl y is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 petitioner's original petition and 14 amended petition are DENIED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 13, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2 Motion to Stay Case. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall not deport or otherwise remove plaintiff Miguel Ramos Meza from the United States pending further order of this court. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 12, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the respondents shall file a response, including addressing whether this court has jurisdiction, to 2 petitioner Miguel Ramos Meza's emergency motion by 12:00 p.m. PST on Friday, 4/13/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at petitioner Meza shall immediately serve the respondents with the petition, the emergency motion for stay of removal, and a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos Meza v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas E. Feely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pamela Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LaTesha Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Ramos Meza
Represented By: Sylvia L. Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?