Dobrijevich v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: Milan Dobrijevich
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2018cv00670
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal of Equifax Information Services LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 12, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 6/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 17, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (First Request). Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 10, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond re 1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage answer due 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobrijevich v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan Dobrijevich
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?