Davis v. Unitel Voice, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Steven R Davis
Defendant: L3 Communications, LLC, Somos, Inc and Unitel Voice, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00673
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 26 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to FILE 9 -1 the proposed Amended First Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to accomplish service is extended until 10/8/18.Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 10, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time. Unitel Voice, LLC answer due 8/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 8, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff Steven R. Davis' Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Mr. Davis shall have 90 days from 4/27/18, to serve the defendants with the summons and complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Davis shall file a certificate of interested parties as required by LR 7.1-1 of the Local Rules of Practice on or before 5/21/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Unitel Voice, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3 Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somos, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitel Voice, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?