Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Wynn Resorts, Limited

Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Defendant: Wynn Resorts, Limited
Unknown: Marc A. Fenster, Kent N Shum, Bahrad A Sokhansanj and Benjamin T Wang
310) 826-6991 (fax: Larry C. Russ
Case Number: 2:2018cv00868
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Joint Stipulation for a 30-day Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint (Second Request). Defendant Wynn Resorts, Limited answer/response due by 8/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 20, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Larry Russ on behalf of plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Judge Mir anda M. Du on 6/20/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 4, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint. Wynn Resorts, Limited response/answer due 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 24, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Bahrad A. Sokhansanj on behalf of plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed b y Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Wynn Resorts, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Marc A. Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kent N Shum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Bahrad A Sokhansanj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Benjamin T Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
310) 826-6991 (fax: Larry C. Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Resorts, Limited
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Lance E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?