Meggs v. Sahara Meadows Properties, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Defendant: Sahara Meadows Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00929
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Deadline: 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John P. Fuller and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert P. Spretnak. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/23/2018. Any Attorney no t yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 5 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Sahara Meadows Properties, Inc.'s answer due 7/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meggs v. Sahara Meadows Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Robert P Spretnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahara Meadows Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?