Howard v. Southwest Gas Corporation
Plaintiff: Janelle Clarkson-Dean, Ebony Howard and Starla Wheeler
Defendant: Southwest Gas Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01035
Filed: June 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement. This case is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 18 , 22 the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final fairness hearing be held on 6/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Stay Case re 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to: 1) Stay the Proceeding; 2) Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer Complaint; and 3) Toll FLSA Limitations Period. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Southwest Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Clarkson-Dean
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Howard
Represented By: Nicholas R. Conlon
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starla Wheeler
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?