Goldberg et al v. Wells Fargo Mortgage, Inc MTC Financial et al

Plaintiff: Florine Goldberg, Julie A Goldberg and Stephen Goldberg
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, and ABC Corps 1-10 and Wells Fargo Mortgage, Inc MTC Financial
Case Number: 2:2018cv01053
Filed: June 11, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 17 plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerk's Office to unseal all filings made in this case to date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 11, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 4 Motion to Seal. Renewed motion due by 6/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: All Parties - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg et al v. Wells Fargo Mortgage, Inc MTC Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine Goldberg
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A Goldberg
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Goldberg
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Represented By: Julie Ann Goldberg
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, and ABC Corps 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Mortgage, Inc MTC Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?