Morehead et al v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Sheryl Morehead and Maurice Morehead
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01074
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 37 Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Plaintiffs Maurice Morehead, Sheryl Morehead. (Stucki, Kyle)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Stipulation; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 35 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Sixth or more Request) re Discovery Eighth Request by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Rich, Jonathan)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Ashlie L Surur terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/5/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 5, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to remove attorney Ashlie L. Surur from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Jaffe, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadllines (Seventh Request). Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Motions due by 2/26/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Seventh Request) re Discovery re #30 Order, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie),
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines Re: #28 Order on Stipulation. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Motions due by 11/16/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Sixth Request) of Discovery re: #28 Order, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie) Modified on 8/3/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD). Modified on 8/3/2020 (SLD).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) re: #26 Order on Stipulation, Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Motions due by 8/31/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 14, 2020 Filing 27 Fifth STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) re Discovery re #26 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #25 Fourth Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Motions due by 5/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re Discovery re #24 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation; SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 1/6/2020. Motions due by 2/5/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #21 ORDER - Discovery Deadlines, filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-01074-RFB-EJY. (no image attached) (MR)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #19 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 11/7/2019. Motions due by 12/6/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding violation of the Local Rules. Document #19 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Ashlie L. Surur. Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The entries have been modified to properly establish the docket-entry relationship, pursuant to the local rules. Attorney is advised in the future failure to comply with the local rules regarding electronic filing may cause a delay in the filing of documents pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #14 ORDER - Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Ashlie L. Surur. Court corrected entry on 5/13/2019 (RFJ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Order in USBC Case 18-15494-btb by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Surur, Ashlie)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Maurice & Sheryl Morehead by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Surur, Ashlie)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE - Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required as to document #15 - Wrong event was selected. Attorney Ashlie L. Surur is advised to refile document #15 using the correct Notice of Bankruptcy event in accordance with LR IC 2-2(c). Documents #15 is terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Ashlie L. Surur. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. NOTICE; filed by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie) Document #15 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 3/14/2019 (RFJ).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 First Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 7/10/2019. Motions due by 8/9/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (SLD)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/12/2019. Motions due by 4/11/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Maurice Morehead, Sheryl Morehead (Stucki, Kyle)
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Surur, Ashlie)
July 5, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
July 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Compliant filing re: document #5 : ERROR - Wrong event selected. Attorney action required. CORRECTION: Attorney Ashlie L. Surur is advised to refile document #5 using the appropriate Statement in Removal Case event pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). Document #5 is terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ)
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie)
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Ashlie L. Surur. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document pursuant to the local rules. RESPONSE to #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Surur, Ashlie) Document #5 is terminated as filed in error on 7/5/2018 (RFJ).
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Surur, Ashlie)
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maurice Morehead, Sheryl Morehead. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stucki, Kyle)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/18/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/3/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-18-772481-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5125014) by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Surur, Ashlie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehead et al v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Morehead
Represented By: Kyle A Stucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Morehead
Represented By: Kyle A Stucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Ashlie L. Surur
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?