International Markets Live, Inc. et al v. Santiago et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Terry and International Markets Live, Inc.
Defendant: Joe Otis, Joel Santiago, Gregory Perdriel, Robbie Issa, Carlos Santiago, Muhammad Zidan and Mack Mills
Case Number: 2:2018cv01112
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-01112-KJD-BNW. (no image attached) (ADR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 6/22/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Joel Santiago, Joe Otis, Carlos Santiago, Robbie Issa.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 10/24/2018. (DKJ)
August 22, 2018 Party Muhammad Zidan terminated pursuant to #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
August 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston)
August 21, 2018 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Perdriel, Muhammad Zidan re #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (JM)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Kerr, Preston) Modified on 8/20/2018 (DKJ).
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #13 , #14 . Incorrect clerks default form used and there is no Motion or Affidavit. Attorney advised: To download and complete "Default" form, from the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov and attach the Motion and Affidavit/Declaration pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 55 and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #13 , #14 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. Muhammad Zidan served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Kerr, Preston)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. Gregory Perdriel served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. (Kerr, Preston)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 , #9 . Documents were not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #8 , #9 using the appropriate docket entry event "Summons Returned Executed". Documents #8 and #9 are terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 ERROR: Incorrect event selected by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile selecting the correct event. AFFIDAVIT of Service re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston) Modified on 8/20/2018 (DKJ).
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 ERROR: Incorrect event selected by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile selecting the correct event. AFFIDAVIT of Service re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston) Modified on 8/20/2018 (DKJ).
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robbie Issa. (JM)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston)
June 25, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joe Otis, Gregory Perdriel, Joel Santiago, Muhammad Zidan re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 25, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry. (Kerr, Preston)
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE re SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by International Markets Live, Inc., Christopher Terry as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint,. (Kerr, Preston) Modified on 6/25/2018 to reflect correct event as summons was not issued by this court and it is not on form AO 440 (DKJ).
June 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by International Markets Live, Inc., a New York corporation, Christopher Terry that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kerr, Preston)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5132351) by International Markets Live, Inc., a New York corporation, Christopher Terry. Proof of service due by 9/20/2018.(Kerr, Preston) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Markets Live, Inc. et al v. Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Otis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Perdriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Issa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Zidan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Terry
Represented By: George Edward Robinson
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Markets Live, Inc.
Represented By: George Edward Robinson
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?