Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co. v. Villegas Lopez et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.
Defendant: Lorenzo Villegas Lopez and Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez
Case Number: 2:2018cv01145
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2018 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/24/2018. Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonicaly #20 is GRANTED. Out-of-state counsel Brandon Sherman may appear telephonically for the Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2018.Mr. Sherman is instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469 and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 23, 2018 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brandon C. Sherman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicole Scott (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5210759) by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Scott, Nicole)
August 22, 2018 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, Attorney Brandon C. Sherman, by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. (Scott, Nicole)
August 17, 2018 19 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Petition for Removal* in this action was filed on* 06/26/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Lorenzo Villegas Lopez.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 9/17/2018. (TR)
August 14, 2018 18 DECLARATION of Thomas M. Mullaney, Esq. (Supplemental) re #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Chance, Travis)
August 13, 2018 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/13/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Based on counsel's telephonic request and good cause appearing, out-of-state counsel Thomas Mullaney may appear telephonically for the Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2018. Mr. Mullaney is instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469 and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 27, 2018 16 NOTICE of Non-Compliant filing with LR IC 5-1 - ERROR: Document #15 was not properly signed/filed by attorneys E. Leif Reid and Nicole Scott in accordance with LR IC 5-1: The attorney who signs the document must be the attorney who electronically files the document. CORRECTION: Attorneys are advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules regrading electronic filing. No further action required concerning documents #15 at this time. (no image attached) (RFJ)
July 26, 2018 15 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court; filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. (Scott, Nicole) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1 by attorneys E. Leif Reid and Nicole Scott. CORRECTION: Attorney are advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules regarding electronic filing procedures on 7/27/2018 (RFJ).
July 26, 2018 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. (Scott, Nicole)
July 26, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission for Thomas M. Mullaney to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Travis F. Chance. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2018 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Mullaney and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Travis F. Chance (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5171297) by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. (Chance, Travis)
July 24, 2018 11 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Chance, Travis)
July 19, 2018 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. Replies due by 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A-1, A-2) (Chance, Travis)
July 17, 2018 9 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. Replies due by 7/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Reid, E.)
July 11, 2018 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. (Chance, Travis)
July 11, 2018 7 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION to Dismiss and #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
July 5, 2018 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.. Responses due by 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Reid, E.)
July 3, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez. Responses due by 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3) (Chance, Travis)
June 26, 2018 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas M. Mullaney to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/10/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 26, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/26/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/11/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MMM)
June 26, 2018 2 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Lorraine Marie S. Lannon. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Chance, Travis)
June 26, 2018 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-773952-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5135820) by Lorraine Marie S. Lannon. Proof of service due by 8/1/2018. (Chance, Travis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Corrected Image #2 Attached on 6/26/2018 (TR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co. v. Villegas Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Villegas Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Marie Sta. Ana Lopez
Represented By: Thomas M. Mullaney
Represented By: Travis Franklin Chance
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: Thomas M Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Bank & Trust Co.
Represented By: Nicole Scott
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?