Laron v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Laron
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01161
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER approving ECF No. #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dana J. Ash and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5209739) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Barwick for Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William Durham Barwick to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2018. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Dana Jeffrey Ash to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2018. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James J. Rosemergy to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2018. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving ECF No. #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice at to attorney Danielle N. Bagwell on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Danielle N. Bagwell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5188685) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sean K. Burke and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tyson E. Hafen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5188638) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/30/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has reviewed the parties' status report (ECF No. #7 ) and directs that the parties file another status report on September 25, 2018 to update the Court as to the status of the parties' settlement discussions. In the meantime, this case will proceed through its normal course and all normal deadlines apply. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/2/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James J. Rosemergy, Dana Jeffrey Ash, Sean K. Burke, William Durham Barwick to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/11/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/27/2018. This action was received on* 6/26/18* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern District of Georgia* and assigned case number 2:18-cv-01161-MMD-CWH. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2018. Verified Petition due by 8/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:16-cv-04771. Original file with documents 1 - 2, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (MMM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/27/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER directing that the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached to this Order, be transferred out of this MDL and remanded to the United States District Courts in which they were originally filed and from which they were transferred to the Court. The Clerk is directed to transfer the cases listed in Exhibit A to their respective District Courts. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to administratively close all cases listed in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/27/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/27/2018.]
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Anthony Laron. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-6888286.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laron v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sean K Burke
Represented By: Dana Jeffrey Ash
Represented By: William Durham Barwick
Represented By: Sean K. Burke
Represented By: Tyson E Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Sean K Burke
Represented By: Dana Jeffrey Ash
Represented By: William Durham Barwick
Represented By: Sean K. Burke
Represented By: Danielle N. Bagwell
Represented By: Tyson E Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Laron
Represented By: James J Rosemergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?