Petty v. Ashcroft et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Petty
Defendant: Robert Caputo and Stephen Will Ashcroft
Case Number: 2:2018cv01323
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mallory T. Biblo and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Korey A. Nelson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney LeElle Krompass and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Warren T. Burns and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mallory T. Biblo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5215614) by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. (Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Korey A. Nelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5215611) by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. (Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by LeElle Krompass and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5215607) by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. (Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Warren Tavares Burns and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5215600) by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. (Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. Replies due by 9/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo by Jamie Petty. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 11/25/2018.(Springmeyer, Don)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freeman, David)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Alternatively MOTION to Stay by Defendants Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BSG Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Claim) (Freeman, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo on 7/23/2018 executed by Jamie Petty re #1 Complaint,. (Springmeyer, Don)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Jamie Petty. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Springmeyer, Don)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Warren T. Burns, LeElle Krompass, Mallory Biblo, and Korey A. Nelson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/2/2018. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jamie Petty. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Springmeyer, Don)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Will Ashcroft, Robert Caputo (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5163632) by Jamie Petty. Proof of service due by 10/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Springmeyer, Don) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty v. Ashcroft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Caputo
Represented By: David J. Freeman
Represented By: Bryce K. Kunimoto
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Will Ashcroft
Represented By: David J. Freeman
Represented By: Bryce K. Kunimoto
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Petty
Represented By: Mallory T Biblo
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: LeElle Bruerea Krompass
Represented By: Korey Nelson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?