Klein et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ingeborg Klein and Karin Klein
Defendant: Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Mallinkrodt LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Guerbet LLC and Mallinkrodt Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01424
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mallinkrodt Inc., Mallinkrodt LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Mallinckrodt, PLC for Mallinkrodt Inc., Mallinkrodt LLC added. (Cools, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Mallinkrodt Inc., Mallinkrodt LLC.(Cools, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas N. Sterchi and Pauld S. Penticuff to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/3/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sanders, LeAnn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2018.(Sanders, LeAnn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the #14 Order to Show Cause is deemed satisfied and this action will not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Drakulich, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Drakulich, Robert)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by 8/27/2018. If the plaintiffs do not file a response to this order by that date the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified on 8/6/2018 (MAJ).
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinkrodt Inc., Mallinkrodt LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. (Drakulich, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Non Compliant filing and Attorney Action Required as to Proposed Summons re: #1 Compliant: - ERROR: Summons not issued, Named Defendants were not properly listed on approved Court Proposed Summons form.CORRECTION : Pursuant to FRCP 4 summons are issued for each named defendants to be served. Attorney Robert J. Drakulich advised to refile a properly completed Summons in a Civil Action" form from Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov pursuant to FRCP 4 and refile as a separate event using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. Summons was issued for properly listed named defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., see docket entry #3 . (no image attached) (RFJ)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Todd A. Walburg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/15/2018. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5179085) by Ingeborg Klein, Karin Klein. Proof of service due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Drakulich, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Thomas N. Sterchi
Represented By: Joel Ken Browning
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinkrodt LLC
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerbet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinkrodt Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingeborg Klein
Represented By: Todd A. Walburg
Represented By: Robert J. Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas J Drakulich
Represented By: Todd Walburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Klein
Represented By: Todd A. Walburg
Represented By: Robert J. Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas J Drakulich
Represented By: Todd Walburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?