Baro v. TransUnion, LLC
Plaintiff: Cecilia M. Baro
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01473
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ADR)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Motions due by 4/19/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro (Miller, Shawn)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #8 Amended Complaint. (ADR)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to SPS by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro. (Krieger, David)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against TransUnion, LLC by Cecilia M. Baro. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/31/2018.(Krieger, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Revzin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time. TransUnion, LLC answer due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Revzin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC added. (Revzin, Jason)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
August 8, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cecilia M. Baro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5188659) by Cecilia M. Baro. Proof of service due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baro v. TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia M. Baro
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Shawn Wayne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?